judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00932-CV
01-89-00932-CV
09/15/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Bank One, Texas N.A. Formerly Deposit Insurance Bridge Bank
Robert L. Moody, Jr.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/26/1990Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals
02/26/1990Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGrant motion
01/29/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
01/29/1990Case ready to be set
01/29/1990Case ready to be set
12/28/1989Order entered
11/16/1989Filing fee paid
11/09/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
11/08/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/07/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
10/16/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
09/28/1989Filing fee paid
09/28/1989Statement of facts filed
09/15/1989Transcript filed
09/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/14/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/26/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeAndrew J. Mytelka
StateAppelleeArnold G. Polanco
StateAppellantJ. Michael Fieglein
Trial Court Information
56th District Court
Galveston
89CV0016-A