judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01116-CV
05-89-01116-CV
09/15/1989
Other Personal Injury
Boyd, Jannett
Safeway Stores, Incorporated, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order enteredDestroy
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
12/01/1997Record RetentionDestroy
07/11/1990Mandate Issued
07/11/1990Mandate Issued
05/17/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/17/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/15/1990Submission
05/15/1990Submitted
05/15/1990Submission
05/15/1990Submitted
05/14/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Denied
05/11/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
04/26/1990Supplemental Transcript filed
04/17/1990Mot Ext Time File Strans DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/16/1990Mot Ext Time File Strans
04/16/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
04/12/1990Letter Filed
04/04/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
04/02/1990MattConv
03/30/1990Response to Motion
03/27/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
03/01/1990Brief Filed
03/01/1990Case ready to be set
03/01/1990Case ready to be set
02/15/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/05/1990Brief Filed
01/25/1990Motion for Dismissal Filed
01/24/1990Letter Sent by the Court
01/17/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/02/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/18/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/13/1989Response to Motion
12/01/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/29/1989Letter Sent by the Court
10/17/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/13/1989MattConv
10/11/1989Collection letter on Filing Fee
10/04/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/21/1989Letter Sent by the Court
09/20/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/20/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
09/15/1989Transcript Filed
09/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/29/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/31/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
59th Judicial District Court
Grayson
Honorable Lloyd Perkins
101,203