judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00868-CR
14-89-00868-CR
09/18/1989
Other Felony
Dubois, David Leon
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/20/1991Case stored
08/06/1991Mandate Issued
08/06/1991Mandate Issued
07/22/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
06/19/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
12/19/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
11/19/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
11/19/1990Extend time to file PDR DISPOSEDGRANTED
10/18/1990Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
09/07/1990Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
08/23/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/23/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/22/1990Submitted
08/22/1990Submission
08/22/1990Submitted
03/08/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/08/1990Case ready to be set
03/08/1990Case ready to be set
02/12/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/11/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
01/11/1990Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
01/04/1990Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
01/04/1990Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
01/02/1990No description available.
11/02/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
10/27/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
10/27/1989Transcript FILED
09/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/11/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
07/25/1989Motion for new trial FILED
07/03/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/20/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantHon. Joe W. Bailey, II
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
470,445
1 yr HCJ/$2,000 fine