judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00863-CR
14-89-00863-CR
09/18/1989
Other Drug Possession
Sam, Leroy Joseph
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/11/1990Case stored
05/08/1990Mandate Issued
05/08/1990Mandate Issued
04/23/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
04/06/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
03/22/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/22/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/07/1990Submitted
03/07/1990Submission
03/07/1990Submitted
02/09/1990Submission
12/27/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/27/1989Case ready to be set
12/27/1989Case ready to be set
12/21/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/06/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/09/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/02/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
11/02/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
10/11/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
10/11/1989Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
09/27/1989No description available.
09/18/1989Transcript FILED
09/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/04/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
07/28/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/11/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantOktavia Carstarphen
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasHon. Susan W. Burris
Trial Court Information
10th District Court
Galveston
Honorable GEORGE WALKER
89CR0062
25 years TDC