judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00921-CV
01-89-00921-CV
09/15/1989
Original proceeding for writ of mandamus (Gov't 22.221(a), (b))
Allen, Larry N.
Hon. Russell T. Lloyd, Judge 334th District Court
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/06/1989Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
10/17/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
10/10/1989Motion for rehearing filed
09/28/1989Opinion issuedOverruled
09/28/1989Opinion issuedOverruled
09/15/1989Motion for leave to file
09/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/06/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateRespondentJohn S. Torigian
StateRespondentPhillip T. Bruns
StateRelatorHon. Richard C. Waites
Trial Court Information
334th District Court
Harris
87-31628