judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00922-CR
01-89-00922-CR
09/15/1989
Felony DWI
Creeden, Thomas
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/20/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/20/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/28/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
07/13/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
06/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/07/1990No description available.
03/01/1990Order enteredOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
11/06/1989Brief due for retained counsel
09/21/1989Transcript filed
09/15/1989Notice of appeal filed
09/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/01/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/20/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StatePRO SEThomas Creeden
StateCriminal - State of TexasJames Kuboviak
Trial Court Information
County Court
Brazos
623-89
$300 fine, $105 ct cst 6dy