judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-9061
C-9061
09/18/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
CHRISTOPHER J. CHAPUT M.D.
THE HONORABLE CLARENCE N. STEVENSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/06/1989Case StoredNO REHEARING FILED
10/04/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedWithdrawn
10/04/1989Motion to withdraw disposed ofFiling granted
09/22/1989Motion to Withdraw FiledREL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS
09/18/1989Exhibits receivedONE COPY
09/18/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
09/18/1989No description available.
09/18/1989Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/06/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
YBARRA, JESSERespondentMr. Jim M. Perdue Sr.
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
135th District Court
Victoria
Honorable Clarence Stevenson
85-10-34,821-B