judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00380-CV
13-89-00380-CV
09/15/1989
Contract
Crabb, Ima R., et al.
Fenner, John Richard and Burney F. Fenner
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/20/1990Mandate Issued
12/18/1990Record returned to Court.
11/14/1990Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
10/17/1990Letter sent
10/15/1990Supreme Court Number
10/09/1990Application of Writ of Error sent to Supreme Court
10/04/1990Response to _____________.
10/01/1990Writ Filed
10/01/1990Writ of Error Fee Paid
08/31/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
08/02/1990Reply to _______
07/13/1990Motion for rehearing filed
06/29/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/29/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/29/1990Opinion issuedReversed, Remanded in part & Affirmed in part
01/25/1990Submitted
01/25/1990Submission
01/19/1990Response to _____________.
01/10/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
12/27/1989Reply Brief Filed
12/22/1989Reply Brief Filed
12/20/1989Reply brief markd
12/20/1989Submission
12/07/1989Reply Brief Filed
11/16/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/16/1989Motion for leave to file Supp. Trans. DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
11/16/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedCarried with the case
11/10/1989Oral argument requested
11/10/1989Brief Filed
11/03/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/31/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/30/1989Sworn Statement filed
10/26/1989Motion for leave to file supplemental transcript
10/26/1989Filing Fee Paid
10/26/1989Sworn Statement filed
10/19/1989Motion to Strike
10/19/1989Motion to Tax Costs
10/19/1989Letter sent to attorneys
10/16/1989Brief Filed
10/16/1989Oral argument requested
10/16/1989Case ready to be set
09/25/1989After Checked Out - Trans. Returned
09/25/1989Supplemental transcript filed
09/25/1989Supplemental transcript recieved
09/21/1989Green card in
09/21/1989Letter sent
09/19/1989Due date for record to be filed
09/19/1989Transcript sent out
09/15/1989Transcript Filed
09/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/17/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/17/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
08/17/1989Exhibits Filed
08/17/1989Filing Fee Paid
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/20/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
FennersAppelleeHon. Marcus F. Schwartz
RobinsonAppellantHon. Oscar 'O. F.' Jones III
Trial Court Information
2nd 25th District Court
Lavaca
Honorable Gus J Strauss
15,397