judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-89-00219-CV
09-89-00219-CV
09/15/1989
Mandamus
Martha Jean Donnaud
Honorable Judge Robert Walker
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/10/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.
06/13/1990Petition for WritDismissed
04/26/1990Petition for Writ
04/11/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/06/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/22/1990Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
02/01/1990Submitted
02/01/1990Submission
11/30/1989Submission
10/13/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/06/1989Response
09/27/1989MOTION TO FILE WRIT OF MANDAMUS GRANTEDMotion or Writ Granted
09/27/1989Writ Filed
09/15/1989Motion to File Writ Filed
09/15/1989Writ Received
09/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/20/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
James Michael DonnaudCivil - Amicus Curiae
Martha Jean DonnaudAppellant
Trial Court Information