judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00929-CR
01-89-00929-CR
09/15/1989
Other Drug Possession
Toliver, Roderic Freeman
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/16/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
09/16/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/06/1991Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
07/03/1991Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
04/15/1991Case file received by higher Court or agency.
04/10/1991Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
04/01/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
03/07/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/07/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/19/1990Submitted
12/19/1990Submission
12/19/1990Submitted
10/09/1990Submission
05/07/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
05/07/1990Case ready to be set
05/07/1990Case ready to be set
04/19/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/09/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/16/1990Supplemental transcript filed
03/13/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
03/08/1990Exhibits filed
03/08/1990Motion strans disposedGrant motion
02/22/1990Motion for leave to file strans
02/22/1990Motion strans disposedGrant motion
02/13/1990Motion for leave to file strans
02/12/1990Statement of facts filed
12/28/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
12/13/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
11/22/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
11/13/1989Transcript filed
11/09/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/14/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
09/14/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/16/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn Boone
StatePRO SE
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - State of TexasJ. Harvey Hudson
StateCriminal - AppellantStanley C. Kirk
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
533,260
18 yrs tdc