judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01108-CR
05-89-01108-CR
09/15/1989
Robbery
Webb, Nellie Joyce
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/06/1991Mandate Issued
02/06/1991Mandate Issued
12/05/1990Record RetentionRetain
12/05/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/05/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/04/1990Submission
12/04/1990Submitted
12/04/1990Submission
12/04/1990Submitted
10/10/1990MattConv
08/20/1990Submitted
05/08/1990Brief Filed
05/08/1990Case ready to be set
05/08/1990Case ready to be set
04/26/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/24/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/11/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/09/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/13/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/09/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/13/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/12/1990Brief Filed
02/12/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/08/1990Letter Sent by the Court
02/01/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/31/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/18/1990Letter Sent by the Court
01/03/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/02/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/22/1989Letter Sent by the Court
11/21/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/20/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/10/1989Letter Sent by the Court
10/10/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/06/1989Transcript Filed
09/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/23/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/11/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/06/1991Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
194th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable F. H. Entz
F88-70888-RM
60 yrs TDC