judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8414
A-8414
05/15/1961
Application for Writ of Error
OLD COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY
CITY OF QUITMAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/08/1962Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
12/26/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
08/15/1961Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/29/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
05/19/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/08/1962Brief in Support of Petition
12/26/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/13/1961Opinion issued
08/15/1961Brief on the Merits
06/07/1961Document received (See Remarks)
06/07/1961Document received (See Remarks)
06/07/1961Document received (See Remarks)
06/07/1961Document received (See Remarks)
05/29/1961Response to Petition
05/19/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/15/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of QuitmanRespondent
Old Colony Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information