judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8378
A-8378
04/28/1961
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF EL PASO
GENE DONOHUE, TRUSTEE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/17/1962Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/13/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/10/1961Response to Reply filedRespondent
07/10/1961Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/05/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/03/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
04/28/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/17/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/03/1962Opinion issued
11/15/1961Response to Motion filed
11/13/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/10/1961Response to Reply filed
07/10/1961Reply to Response
06/07/1961Document received (See Remarks)
06/07/1961Document received (See Remarks)
06/05/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/03/1961Response to Petition
04/28/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/28/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Paul StrongAmicus Curiae
City of El PasoPetitioner
Burke HolmanAmicus Curiae
Gene Donohue, Trustee, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information