judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8374
A-8374
04/27/1961
Application for Writ of Error
LEE G. BREWER
CENTRAL GREENHOUSE CORPORATION, DBA GREENWOOD GREENHOUSES
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/19/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/20/1961Response to Brief filedRespondent
11/09/1961Supplement to ResponseRespondent
08/07/1961Brief in Support of PetitionAmicus Curiae
07/18/1961Brief on the MeritsAmicus Curiae
07/05/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/12/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
04/27/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/19/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/20/1961Response to Brief filed
11/09/1961Supplement to Response
10/03/1961Document received (See Remarks)
08/07/1961Brief in Support of Petition
07/18/1961Brief on the Merits
07/05/1961Motion for RehearingFiling granted
07/01/1961Opinion issued
05/24/1961Miscellaneous letter
05/12/1961Response to Petition
04/27/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/27/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Central Greenhouse Corporation, dba Greenwood GreenhousesRespondent
Lee G. BrewerPetitioner
Arthur J. Goldberg, Secretary of LaborAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information