judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8372
A-8372
04/26/1961
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
WILLIAM C. PRESTON, JR.
MARY M. PRESTON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/31/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/31/1961Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
05/31/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
05/31/1961Brief on the MeritsRespondent
04/26/1961Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedPetitioner
04/26/1961Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/31/1961Motion for RehearingDismissed
07/26/1961Order from Lower Court filed
07/22/1961Motion to dismissFiling granted
06/28/1961Dissenting opinion issued.
06/28/1961Opinion issued
06/01/1961Letter Filed
05/31/1961Supplemental Brief filed
05/31/1961Response to Petition
05/31/1961Brief on the Merits
04/26/1961Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed
04/26/1961Order from Lower Court filed
04/26/1961Brief on the Merits
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mary M. PrestonRespondent
William C. Preston, Jr.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information