judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALADDIN GAMING VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38279
Short Caption:ALADDIN GAMING VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40210 , 41700 , 41834 , 48501
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A427673Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Becker, LeavittCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Agosti for Justice BeckerPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/07/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Aladdin Gaming.
08/07/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
08/07/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Leavitt, Sully & Rivers.
08/07/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lionel Sawyer & Collins--check no. 120015.
08/07/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 01-13294
08/07/2001AppendixFiled Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. 01-13295
11/15/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 01/31/02 ORDER: 11/15/01 ORDER VACATED. 01-19118
11/26/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Filing of Bankruptcy. 01-19686
12/07/2001Other Other. Filed Affidavit of David J. Rivers Re Order Directing Answer. 01-20566
01/31/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Status of Bankruptcy Stay. On November 15, 2001, this court ordered the real party in interest to file an answer to the petition. On November 26, 2001, Aladdin notified this court that it had filed a Chapter 11 bankruptcy petition on September 28, 2001. Thus, this court's November 15, 2001 order directing an answer to the writ petition was a nullity, and is hereby vacated. fn4[We censure Aladdin's counsel for failing to inform this court for two months that Aladdin had filed a Chapter 11 bankruptcy petition. This court would prefer not to utilize its limited and valuable judicial resources issuing void orders.] Because of the automatic stay, Aladdin's writ petition shall be held in abeyance on this court's docket during the stay's duration. Aladdin shall inform this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings, insofar as the automatic stay is concerned, within 90 days from the date of this order, and each ninety days thereafter until further order of this court. When the stay is lifted or the bankruptcy proceedings terminate, Aladdin shall notify this court of that fact within 15 days. Failure to comply with this schedule may result in the imposition of sanctions. 02-02065
11/21/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Lifting Stay in Bankruptcy Court. 02-20045
11/21/2002Petition/WritFiled Supplement to Petition for Writ. Supplement to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed August 8, 2001, and Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 02-20048
11/21/2002AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix to Supplement to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed August 8, 2001, and Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 02-20049
05/29/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. On November 21, 2002, petitioner notified this court that the bankruptcy court had terminated its automatic stay to allow arbitration of the petitioner's and the real party in interest's claims. Thus, it appears that we may now consider the instant writ petition and supplement. The real party in interest, on respondents' behalf, shall have 30 days from this order's date to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 03-08949
06/27/2003Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Response to Order to Answer. 03-10802
06/27/2003AppendixFiled Appendix. Real Party's Appendix to Response to Order to Answer. 03-10804
06/27/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Filing Appendix to Response to Order to Answer. 03-10814
08/13/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. for Writ of Mandamus. "We deny the petition." SNP03-DA/RR/WM 03-13508
09/09/2003RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 03-13861
09/09/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.