judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SANDRA JORDAN V. DC COMM'N ON HUMAN RIGHTS

Case Information: 10-AA-1462
Short Caption:SANDRA JORDAN V. DC COMM'N ON HUMAN RIGHTSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Commission On Human Rights (CHR)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PCN406-08Filed Date:11/24/2010

Opening Event Date:11/24/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/10/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/27/2012
Argued/Submitted:09/12/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/07/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Intervenor-RespondentSmall Savers Child Development CenterN
Benjamin W. HahnYN
PetitionerSandra Jordan N
Denise M. ClarkYY
RespondentD.C. Commission on Human RightsN
Todd S. KimNY
Holly M. JohnsonNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/24/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
11/24/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
11/30/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq.
06/27/2011RECEIVED- GHMSI's response to Appleseed's motion to supplement
08/10/2011FiledRecord On Appeal
08/10/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/19/2011FiledMotion For Leave to intervene Small Savers Child Development Center on behalf of RespGranted
09/14/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to intervene Small Savers Child Development Center on behalf of Resp
09/14/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/24/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
10/24/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
11/28/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief - for 60 days (Intervenor-Respondent Small Savers Child Development Center, Respondent D.C. Commission on Human Rights)Granted
12/02/2011FiledOpposition - to joint motion of DC Commisision on Human Rights and Small Savers Child Development Center (Respondent and Intervenor) to enlarge the briefing schedule by an additional 60 days (Petitioner)
12/21/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief - for 60 days (Intervenor-Respondent Small Savers Child Development Center, Respondent D.C. Commission on Human Rights) 1/27/2012
01/10/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief - 14 days after respondents file initial briefs (Petitioner)Granted
01/13/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief - 14 days after respondents file initial briefs (Petitioner)
01/20/2012FiledMemorandum/Statement In Lieu Of Brief (Respondent)
01/27/2012FiledBrief (Intervenor-Respondent)
01/27/2012FiledBriefing Completed
02/01/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief Reply Brief (Petitioner)Granted
02/15/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief Reply Brief (Petitioner) - 3/2/12
03/02/2012FiledReply Brief (Petitioner)
06/26/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/12/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Easterly, McLeese, Steadman
01/16/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Easterly and McLeese, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
02/07/2013FiledMandate