judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

EMPLOYERS CASUALTY COMPANY v. TRANSPORT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case: B-1302
B-1302
01/08/1969
Application for Writ of Error
EMPLOYERS CASUALTY COMPANY
TRANSPORT INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/03/1969Response to Reply filedRespondent
02/24/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/11/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/27/1969Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
01/08/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/30/1969Dissenting opinion issued.
07/30/1969Opinion issued
03/12/1969Document received (See Remarks)
03/03/1969Response to Reply filed
02/24/1969Reply to Response
02/11/1969Response to Petition
01/27/1969Brief in Support of Petition
01/08/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/08/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
EMPLOYERS CASUALTY COMPANYPetitioner
TRANSPORT INSURANCE COMPANYRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information