judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRYON THROCKMARTIN and, VANESSA THROCKMARTIN v. VICKI MEANS NELSON; and REAL ESTATE PROFESSIONALS, INC., a Wyoming corporation, d/b/a RE/MAX PROFESSIONALS

Case Heading (S-08-0269)
Case Number:S-08-0269Case Docketed On:12/15/2008
Linked To: S-08-0250
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:BRYON THROCKMARTIN and, VANESSA THROCKMARTIN v. VICKI MEANS NELSON; and REAL ESTATE PROFESSIONALS, INC., a Wyoming corporation, d/b/a RE/MAX PROFESSIONALS
Full Title:BRYON THROCKMARTIN and, VANESSA THROCKMARTIN, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. VICKI MEANS NELSON; and REAL ESTATE PROFESSIONALS, INC., a Wyoming corporation, d/b/a RE/MAX PROFESSIONALS, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBryon ThrockmartinJessica Rutzick
AppellantVanessa ThrockmartinJessica Rutzick
AppelleeVicki Means NelsonPatrick J. Murphy
P. Craig Silva
AppelleeReal Estate Professionals d/b/a Re/Max ProfessionalsP. Craig Silva
Patrick J. Murphy

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Professional negligence, Property - Real
Opinion Number:2010 WY 23
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/15/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/15/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/15/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Unopposed Motion for Substitution of Counsel Pursuant to W.R.A.P. Counsel of record not served with motion. Called counsel and requested he file motion to withdraw.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
01/28/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/29/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' brief; and received copy of plaintiffs' designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/20/2009Event - Phone Call. Contacted Mr. Willoughby and left message requesting withdrawal from case.EventPhone CallFinal
02/26/2009Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
02/26/2009Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel. Phillip Willoughby allowed to withdraw as counsel for appellees.OrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
03/13/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' Brief and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/18/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/20/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Depositions and Exhibits; Volume V, Amended Index and Additional Original Pleadings.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - P. Craig Silva for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jessica Rutzick for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/25/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jessica Rutzick for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/30/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/31/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/07/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Reply Brief (Held brief waiting for corrected certificate of service)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/22/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Jessica Rutzick for appellant; Billie LM Addleman and P. Craig Silva for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/22/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/03/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/19/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/19/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/24/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/23/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal