Case Information: 10-AA-1460 | |||
Short Caption: | LLOYD W. BELL V. WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | DOES01952-10 | Filed Date: | 11/24/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 11/24/2010 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 03/17/2011 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | Y |
Briefs Completed: | 06/15/2011 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 01/11/2012 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 07/26/2012 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Petitioner | Lloyd W. Bell | N | Pro Se | N | ||||||||
Respondent | Washington Hospital Center | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
11/24/2010 | PETITION FOR REVIEW | |||
11/24/2010 | FILING FEE of $100.00. | |||
11/24/2010 | CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq. | |||
12/08/2010 | On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that Washington Hospital Center is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 9D.C. 2001); D.C. APP. R. 15 (A)(5). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC) | |||
12/15/2010 | APPEARANCE - of Trina L. Fairley-Barlow & Daniel M. Creekman on behalf of respondent | |||
03/17/2011 | RECORD ON APPEAL w/hearing 10/8/10 | |||
03/17/2011 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
03/21/2011 | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC) | |||
04/07/2011 | STATEMENT - from petitioner for intended contents of appendix to petitioner's brief | |||
04/26/2011 | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 10 days | |||
05/10/2011 | RECEIVED - Petitioner's Brief w/Appendix attached | |||
05/16/2011 | On consideration of petitioner_ motion for for an extnesion of time within which to file the brief and the appenidx, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged brief and appendix, is it ORDERED that petitioenr's motion is granted and the lodged brief and appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (JAC) | |||
05/16/2011 | PETITIONER'S BRIEF | |||
05/16/2011 | APPENDIX | |||
06/15/2011 | RESPONDENT'S BRIEF (w/appendix attached) | |||
06/15/2011 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
06/23/2011 | Filed | PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION requesting that respondent serve brief in a timely manner (construed as motion for an extension of time to file reply brief) | ||
06/23/2011 | Filed | Final Screening-Summary | ||
07/12/2011 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File to response to petitioner's motion for extension of time to file brief (Respondent) | Granted | |
08/09/2011 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Leave and the Clerk shall file the lodged response of respondent and the lodged reply of petitioner. | ||
08/09/2011 | Filed | Answer/Response to petitioner's motion for an extension (Respondent) | ||
08/09/2011 | Filed | Answer/Response to Respondent's Response to Petitioner's Motion for an Extension. (Petitioner) | ||
08/09/2011 | Filed | Order Granting petitioner's motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief and the Clerk shall file the lodged reply brief. | ||
08/09/2011 | Filed | Answer/Response to Respondent's Motion for Leave (Petitioner) | ||
08/09/2011 | Filed | Reply Brief (Petitioner) | ||
11/30/2011 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
01/11/2012 | Filed | Submitted to Judges Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, Schwelb | ||
06/08/2012 | Filed | Affirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.) | ||
06/22/2012 | Filed | Petition For Rehearing En Banc (Petitioner) | Denied | |
07/17/2012 | Filed | Order Denying Petitioner's petition for rehearing en banc | ||
07/26/2012 | Filed | Mandate | ||
12/17/2012 | Filed | Copy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Petitioner) | ||
02/20/2013 | Filed | Notice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Petitioner) |