Case Information: 38278 | |||
Short Caption: | BRINTON VS. STATE, REAL ESTATE DIVISION | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34461 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A397875 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Maupin | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 08/10/2001 / Levitt, Lansford | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/06/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Swanson-Flangas & Associates LLC--check no. 1582. | ||
08/06/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-13285 | |
08/06/2001 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. | ||
08/08/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Orders filed 4/17/01 and 5/9/01; and Notices of entry filed 4/19/01 and 5/13/01. Due Date: 10 days | ||
08/10/2001 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
08/20/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copies of Orders filed 4/17/01 and 5/9/01 and Notices of entry filed 4/19/01 and 5/15/01. | 01-14114 | |
08/22/2001 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 01-14250 | |
08/22/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copies of Orders filed 4/17/01 and 5/9/01 and Notices of entry filed 4/19/01 and 5/15/01. | 01-14264 | |
08/23/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Lansford W. Levitt. | ||
08/24/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Lansford W. Levitt. | ||
09/28/2001 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: July 18, 2001 (2). Court Reporter: Cindy S. Magnussen. | 01-16382 | |
12/31/2001 | Settlement Agreement | Filed Settlement Agreement. The parties have agreed to settlement of this matter. | 01-21945 | |
01/14/2002 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 02-00977 | |
01/30/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 02-01945 | |
01/30/2002 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |