judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8406
A-8406
05/10/1961
Application for Writ of Error
LILLIAN A. WEYEL, ET AL.
BOARD OF FIREMEN, POLICEMEN AND FIRE ALARM OPERATORS PENSION FUND TRUSTEES OF SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/26/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/06/1961Response to Brief filedRespondent
05/30/1961Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/23/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
05/10/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/06/1961Response to Motion filed
06/26/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/06/1961Response to Brief filed
05/30/1961Reply to Response
05/23/1961Response to Petition
05/10/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/10/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lillian A. Weyel, et al.Petitioner
Board of Firemen, Policemen and Fire Alarm Operators Pension Fund Trustees of San Antonio, Texas, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information