judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8411
A-8411
05/11/1961
Application for Writ of Error
VESTER MIKELL, ET AL.
C. A. LA BETH
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/05/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/16/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
06/05/1961Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
05/26/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
05/11/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/10/1961Response to Motion filed
07/05/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/16/1961Response to Petition
06/05/1961Supplement to Petition filed
05/26/1961Response to Petition
05/11/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/11/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
C. A. La BethRespondent
Vester Mikell, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information