judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8417
A-8417
05/17/1961
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
STATE MUTUAL LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/01/1962Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/28/1961Brief on the MeritsRespondent
12/28/1961Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
12/04/1961Response to Brief filedRespondent
11/20/1961Post submission brief filedPetitioner
11/13/1961Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
11/10/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/31/1961Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/29/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
05/20/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/17/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/12/1962Response to Motion filed
02/01/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/17/1962Opinion issued
12/28/1961Brief on the Merits
12/28/1961Brief on the Merits
12/11/1961Document received (See Remarks)
12/11/1961Document received (See Remarks)
12/11/1961Document received (See Remarks)
12/04/1961Response to Brief filed
11/20/1961Post submission brief filed
11/13/1961Supplemental Brief filed
11/10/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/11/1961Document received (See Remarks)
05/31/1961Reply to Response
05/29/1961Response to Petition
05/20/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/17/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/17/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jack R. WahlquistAmicus Curiae
State of TexasPetitioner
State Mutual Life Assurance Company of AmericaRespondent
Paul McCarrollAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information