judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-9084
C-9084
09/21/1989
App Writ of Error
THE STATE OF TEXAS
$4097 IN U. S. CURRENCY & 1980 GMC P/U VINTCZ14AS507291
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/24/1989Brief receivedRespondent12 COPIES OF COA BRIEF
10/24/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent2ND M/E/T ATTACHED
10/12/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)OF WINSTON E. COCHRAN, JR., ASST DISTRICT ATTORNEY, 201 FANNIN, SUITE 200, HOUSTON, TX 77002
10/05/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)OF AL W. SCHORRE, DA & WAYNE FROST, ASST. DA, 200 W. WALL ST., 4TH FL., MIDLAND TX 79701 (915) 688-1041
09/21/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/20/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
11/08/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
10/24/1989Brief received12 COPIES OF COA BRIEF
10/24/1989Reply to Response2ND M/E/T ATTACHED
10/16/1989MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedREPLY ON BEHALF OF J WILLIAMS DUE ON 10-20-89
10/12/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedOF WINSTON E. COCHRAN, JR., ASST DISTRICT ATTORNEY, 201 FANNIN, SUITE 200, HOUSTON, TX 77002
10/12/1989Case forwarded to Court
10/12/1989No description available.
10/05/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedOF AL W. SCHORRE, DA & WAYNE FROST, ASST. DA, 200 W. WALL ST., 4TH FL., MIDLAND TX 79701 (915) 688-1041
09/21/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/20/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
1980 P/U VIN TCS14AS507291RespondentMr. Jack W. Beech
Court of Appeals Information:
02-88-00213-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
___ SW2d ___, 06-01-89
2nd Court of Appeals
Honorable LAWRENCE E. MEYERS
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Clyde Whiteside
213-661