judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-9085
C-9085
09/21/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
A & T CONSULTANTS INC.
BOB BULLOCK STATE COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/30/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondentON BEHALF OF BOB BULLOCK
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/01/1989Case StoredNO REHEARING FILED
11/08/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruled
11/08/1989Notice of change of counselNOTICE OF CHANGE OF DESIGNATION OF AGENCY COUNSEL
10/30/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusON BEHALF OF BOB BULLOCK
10/18/1989Request made for reply to proceedingREPLY ON OR BEFORE10-30-89.
09/21/1989Exhibits receivedATTACHED TO PETITION.
09/21/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
09/21/1989No description available.
09/21/1989Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/01/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information