judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01130-CV
05-89-01130-CV
09/20/1989
Mandamus
Region, Jo Ann
Frank Andrews, Judge, 116th. District Court, Dallas County,
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
11/06/1997Record RetentionDestroy
11/28/1989MattConv
11/06/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/31/1989Response to Motion
10/24/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/24/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/23/1989Motion for Leave to File
10/23/1989Supplemental Brief Filed
10/18/1989Order Entered
10/17/1989Response to Motion
10/13/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/12/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans
10/02/1989Response to Motion
09/22/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/20/1989MattConv
09/20/1989Motion for Leave to File
09/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
116th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Frank Andrews
88-15173-F