judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01126-CR
05-89-01126-CR
09/20/1989
Burglary
Wehmeyer, Sammy K.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/27/1991Mandate Issued
03/27/1991Mandate Issued
03/15/1991Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
03/15/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
11/29/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
10/25/1990Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/1990Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCAMotion or Writ Granted
09/20/1990Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
09/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/19/1990Submission
09/19/1990Submitted
09/19/1990Submission
09/19/1990Submitted
06/29/1990MattConv
03/16/1990Brief Filed
03/16/1990Case ready to be set
03/16/1990Case ready to be set
03/15/1990Letter Sent by the Court
02/13/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/12/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/17/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/16/1990Brief Filed
01/16/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/11/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/07/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/27/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/26/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/25/1989Letter Sent by the Court
09/22/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/20/1989Transcript Filed
09/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/09/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/26/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/27/1991Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
336th Judicial District Court
Grayson
Honorable Ray Felty Grisham
36,937
50 yrs TDC