judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-89-00304-CR
07-89-00304-CR
09/20/1989
Other Felony
Texas, The State of
Eaves, Rickey J.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/21/1990Mandate Issued
02/28/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/20/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
01/18/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/07/1989Submitted
12/07/1989Submission
11/17/1989Submission
10/19/1989Brief Filed
10/19/1989Case ready to be set
10/19/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/19/1989Case ready to be set
10/04/1989Brief Filed
09/20/1989Do not use
09/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/21/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1
Potter
Honorable John R. McFall
52490