judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00236-CR
12-89-00236-CR
09/20/1989
Other Drug Possession
Morgan, William
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/22/1992
09/17/1992Mandate Issued
09/17/1992No Description Available.
09/01/1992
08/17/1992
07/31/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/31/1992Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
01/30/1992Submitted
01/30/1992Submission
01/09/1992Submission
12/11/1991supplemental transcript filed
08/13/1991Letter from the Court
03/05/1990
02/21/1990Brief Filed
02/21/1990Case ready to be set
02/02/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/02/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
01/18/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/29/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/29/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
12/27/1989Brief Filed
12/27/1989Brief Received
12/27/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/21/1989Letter from the Court
12/21/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Overruled
12/21/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
11/30/1989Letter from the Court
11/22/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/20/1989
10/10/1989No Description Available.
09/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/29/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
08/24/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/17/1992RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
09/22/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasMs. C. Patrice Savage
Morgan, WilliamCriminal - AppellantMs. Nancy Fuller
Trial Court Information
188th District Court
Gregg
Honorable Larry W Starr
17,154-A
Life/$25,00 Fine