judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00944-CV
01-89-00944-CV
09/20/1989
Original proceeding for writ of mandamus (Gov't 22.221(a), (b))
Green, Mary L.
I. Allen Lerner, Judge 56th District Court, Galveston County
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/07/1989Motion for rehearing was not filed
11/22/1989Opinion issuedOverruled
11/22/1989Opinion issuedOverruled
11/01/1989Exhibits filed
10/11/1989Statement of facts filed
10/04/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
09/20/1989Filing fee paid
09/20/1989Motion for leave to file
09/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/07/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateRelatorJohn L. Schouest
StateRespondentSamuel B. Kent
StateRespondentF. Walter Conrad
StateRelatorA. Lee McLain
StateRespondentReagan Simpson
StateRelatorT. Wade Welch
StateRespondentPhillip Werner
StateRespondentDavid R. Poage
Trial Court Information
56th District Court
Galveston