judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00942-CR
01-89-00942-CR
09/20/1989
Other Drug Possession
Jackson, Ricky Eugene
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/09/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/09/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/03/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
05/03/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
04/17/1990Motion to withdraw appeal
03/01/1990Order enteredOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
10/30/1989Brief due for retained counsel
09/20/1989Transcript filed
09/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/21/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/09/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasMichael J. Guarino
StateCriminal - AppellantShirley Pardee Napier
Trial Court Information
10th District Court
Galveston
Honorable ISRAEL LERNER
89CR0378
7 & 1/2 years tdc