judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEWTON (MARK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38295
Short Caption:NEWTON (MARK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C170655Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-13550
11/09/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant's counsel Scott Coffee shall have 20 days to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed. 01-18746
11/19/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-19298
12/05/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. On November 19, 2001, counsel filed a response to the show cause order, in which counsel concedes that this court lacks jurisdiction. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20336
01/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20533
01/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 7, 2002. 01-20533