judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ARTHUR EDWARD STEWART v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0006)
Case Number:S-09-0006Case Docketed On:01/07/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Other
Short Title:ARTHUR EDWARD STEWART v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ARTHUR EDWARD STEWART, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantArthur Edward StewartDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/07/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/21/2009Order - Convert to petition - untimely appealOrderConvert to petitionFinal
02/24/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/25/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/03/2009Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
03/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and WaiverEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/04/2009Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
03/04/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal