judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1287-89
PD-1287-89
09/21/1989
PDR Case Type
MACIAS, ALBERT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/24/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/21/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Macias, AlbertApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Jacquelyn L. Snyder
STATE OF TEXASStateFred Rodriguez
Court of Appeals Information:
04-88-00564-CR
Aff 7-26-89
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
226th District Court
Bexar
Honorable SID L. HARLE
87-CR-3044