judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-9080
C-9080
09/21/1989
App Writ of Error
TRIPP VILLAGE JOINT VENTURE
MBANK LINCOLN CENTRE N.A.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/06/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
09/21/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/16/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
12/13/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
10/17/1989Notice from Counsel of a change in address
10/12/1989Case forwarded to Court
10/12/1989No description available.
10/06/1989Reply to Response
09/21/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/16/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-01107-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
___ SW2d ___, 07-05-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
160th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Henry G. Andrews
88-4519-H