judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00877-CR
14-89-00877-CR
09/21/1989
Assault & battery
McMillian, Edward
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/15/1994Case stored
08/15/1994Mandate Issued
08/15/1994Mandate Issued
07/29/1994Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
04/29/1994Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
04/14/1994Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
04/01/1994No motion for rehearing FILED
03/17/1994Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/17/1994Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
02/03/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/03/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/26/1994Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA,
01/26/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/24/1994Past due brief
12/21/1993RECORD RETURNED ON REMAND TO COURT OF APPEALS
12/21/1993Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREVERSED AND REMANDED
12/15/1993Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/15/1993Case ready to be set
12/15/1993Case ready to be set
09/22/1993Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREVERSED AND REMANDED
05/05/1993Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
05/03/1993Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
04/27/1993Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
04/19/1993Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
04/02/1993No motion for rehearing FILED
03/18/1993Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/17/1993Submitted
03/17/1993Submission
03/17/1993Submitted
03/08/1993Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/08/1993Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDGRANTED
12/12/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDGRANTED
09/27/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
09/10/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
08/30/1990Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAGRANTED
08/30/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/30/1990Opinion Withdrawn
08/30/1990Motion for rehearing granted
06/28/1990Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
06/28/1990Order Entered
06/15/1990Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
06/15/1990Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
06/05/1990Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA
05/31/1990Opinion issuedDISMISSED
05/31/1990Opinion issuedDISMISSED
05/23/1990Submitted
05/23/1990Submission
05/23/1990Submitted
05/02/1990Submission
04/19/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/19/1990Case ready to be set
04/19/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/19/1990Case ready to be set
04/16/1990Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA,
04/12/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/15/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/01/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
03/01/1990Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
02/23/1990Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
02/22/1990Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
02/20/1990No description available.
01/25/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
01/22/1990Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
01/18/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
01/12/1990Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
11/16/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
11/13/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
11/13/1989Transcript FILED
09/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/14/1989Date of Sentence
09/14/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/15/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantDouglas M. O'Brien
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
Trial Court Information
351st District Court
Harris
Honorable LUPE SALINAS
527,513
10 yrs TDC/$5000 fine