judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1289-89
PD-1289-89
09/21/1989
PDR Case Type
RODRIGUEZ, ADALBERTO
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/24/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/21/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJose M. Rubio, Jr.
Rodriguez, AdalbertoApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Oscar J. Pena, Sr.
Court of Appeals Information:
04-87-00674-CR
Aff 7-31-89
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
49th District Court
Webb
Honorable MANUEL R. FLORES
20,794