judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1285-89
PD-1285-89
09/21/1989
PDR Case Type
SMITHWICK, ISMAEL, SR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/24/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/21/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SMITHWICK, ISMAELSR.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Werner A. Gohmert
STATE OF TEXASStateRichard Terrell
Court of Appeals Information:
04-88-00533-CR
Aff 7-26-89
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
79th District Court
Jim Wells
Honorable C. W. Laughlin
4272