judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1286-89
PD-1286-89
09/21/1989
PDR Case Type
DIVER, KATHERINE ANN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/24/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/21/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateFred Rodriguez
DIVER, KATHERINE ANNApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Paul J. Goeke
Court of Appeals Information:
04-87-00536-CR
Aff 6-14-89
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 9
Bexar
Honorable Bonnie Reed
388611