judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01138-CV
05-89-01138-CV
09/20/1989
Contract
J. M. Eidson & Associates, Inc.
Konrad J. Kaltenbach
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
11/06/1997Record RetentionDestroy
01/11/1990Mandate Issued
01/11/1990Mandate Issued
10/20/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
10/20/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
10/18/1989Response to Motion
10/11/1989Collection letter on Filing Fee
10/09/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/20/1989Transcript Filed
09/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/15/1989Appeal Bond Filed
06/19/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Hugh T. Snodgrass
85-14398-D