judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00448-CR
04-89-00448-CR
09/20/1989
All Misdemeanors
McRae, Rickie Lynn
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/16/1990Mandate received by the trial court
10/12/1990Mandate Issued
10/12/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
10/12/1990Mandate Issued
09/12/1990Higher Court DecisionRefused
05/15/1990No New Event but Update in Calendar
05/11/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/04/1990Petition for Review Filed
04/04/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/04/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/21/1990Submitted
03/21/1990Submission
03/21/1990Submitted
02/12/1990Submission
02/02/1990Case ready to be set
02/02/1990Case ready to be set
11/28/1989Mot. EOT to file Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/17/1989Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
11/17/1989Brief Filed
11/17/1989Mot. EOT to file Record Filed
10/30/1989Mot. EOT to file NOA DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/18/1989Mot. EOT to file NOA Filed
10/18/1989No Description Available.
10/18/1989No Description Available.
10/02/1989No Description Available.
09/29/1989No Description Available.
09/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/18/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/20/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/12/1990Case StoredCase stored
10/12/2015RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court
Gillespie
Honorable Jay Weinheimer
5087
unknown