judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1177-89
PD-1177-89
08/21/1989
PDR Case Type
SANDERS, ROBERT EARL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/01/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/22/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
08/21/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/28/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SANDERS, ROBERT EARLApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Hoagie L. Karels
STATE OF TEXASStatePaul E. Gartner, Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
10-88-00048-CR
Aff 7-6-89
10th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
54th District Court
McLennan
Honorable GEORGE ALLEN
87-880-C