judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: AP-70,881
AP-70,881
08/21/1989
Appeal Case Type
FULLER, TYRONE LEROY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/24/1991SUPP BR FILEDState
10/15/1991SUPP BR FILEDAppellant
06/19/1991BRIEF FILEDState
05/28/1991BRIEF RECEIVEDAmicus Curiae
01/29/1991BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/02/2001ARCHIVED
07/12/1999EXECUTED
07/05/1993WRIT OF CERT USSCDENIED
07/06/1992WRIT OF CERT USSCFiled
05/11/1992RECALL MANDATE MOTDENIED
05/11/1992RECALL MANDATE MOTDENIED
04/10/1992Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process
04/10/1992MANDATE ISSD
03/25/1992OPINION ISSDAffirmed
03/25/1992OPINION ISSDAffirmed
10/24/1991Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
10/24/1991SUBMITTED
10/24/1991SUPP BR FILED
10/15/1991MOTIONGranted
10/15/1991SUPP BR FILED
10/14/1991MOTION FILED
07/02/1991MOTION TO RESET ORAL ARGUMENT Granted
06/20/1991Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process
06/20/1991ORDER FILED
06/20/1991SET FOR SUBMIS
06/19/1991BRIEF FILED
05/28/1991BRIEF RECEIVED
05/28/1991EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
05/28/1991EXT BRIEF FILED
02/25/1991EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
02/25/1991EXT BRIEF FILED
01/29/1991BRIEF FILED
01/29/1991EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
01/29/1991EXT BRIEF FILED
12/19/1990EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
12/19/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
08/21/1990EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
08/21/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
05/09/1990EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
05/09/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
04/23/1990SUPP RECORD MOT TOGranted
04/23/1990SUPP RECORD MOT TOGranted
04/23/1990SUPP SF FILED
11/22/1989PARTIAL SF FILED
11/20/1989EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
11/20/1989EXT BRIEF FILED
11/20/1989MOTIONGranted
11/20/1989MOTION FILED
11/20/1989SUPP TR FILED
10/31/1989MOTIONFiled
10/27/1989MOTION FILED
10/24/1989MOTIONDENIED
10/23/1989MOTION FILED
10/23/1989SF FILED DP
09/18/1989EXT SF DISPGranted
09/18/1989EXT SF FILED
08/21/1989TRANSCRIPT FILED
06/26/1989EXT SF DISPGranted
06/23/1989DP BEGIN
06/23/1989DP BEGIN
06/23/1989EXT SF FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/02/2001STOREDARCHIVED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
FULLER, TYRONE LEROYApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Carol Hammond
STATE OF TEXASStateTom Wells
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
59th District Court
Grayson
Honorable Henry Braswell
36798