judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8981
C-8981
08/21/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION
THE HONORABLE RICARDO H. GARCIA JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/01/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondent
08/21/1989Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/28/1989Case StoredNO REHEARING FILED
09/13/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedWithdrawn
09/13/1989Motion to withdraw disposed ofFiling grantedRELATOR'S MO/WITHDRAW M/L/F.
09/13/1989Stay order vacated. See remarks & op/disp screenSTAY OF 8/22/89 VACATED & SET ASIDE.
09/01/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus
08/28/1989Motion to Withdraw Filed
08/22/1989Motion for temporary relief disposedFiling grantedREPLY DUE 09-01-89
08/22/1989Stay Order issuedORDER OF 7/21/89 IN 229TH D.C./DUVAL CO. CASE NO. 13,275 IS STAYED UNTIL SUPREME COURT ACTS.
08/21/1989Brief in Support of Petition
08/21/1989Exhibits received12 VOLUMES
08/21/1989Motion for temporary relief
08/21/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
08/21/1989Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/28/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
GARZA, DANIEL SANCHEZRespondentMr. Robert J. Patterson
ROGELIO CANTURespondentMr. Jaime Omar Garza
WORSHAM, D/B/A MODEL MARKETRespondentMs. Rebecca R. Kieschnick
GARZA, ALICIA SANCHEZRespondentMr. Robert J. Patterson
EMERSON RADIO CORPORATIONRespondentMr. John O. Miller III
GARZA, CELESTINORespondentMr. Robert J. Patterson
GARZA, ROSARespondentMr. Robert J. Patterson
CENTRAL POWER & LIGHTRespondentMr. James W. Wray Jr.
CANTU, ROSIE LEERespondentMr. Robert J. Patterson
GARZA, III, CELESTINORespondentMr. Robert J. Patterson
Court of Appeals Information:
04-89-00370-CV
Grant
___ SW2d ___, 08-16-89
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable DAVID PEEPLES
Trial Court Information
229th District Court
Duval
Honorable Ricardo Garcia
13,275