judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

WILLIAM A. KING, ET UX. v. KENNETH R. FLAMM

Case: B-1288
B-1288
01/06/1969
Application for Writ of Error
WILLIAM A. KING, ET UX.
KENNETH R. FLAMM
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/25/1969Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/10/1969Post submission brief filedRespondent
03/31/1969Supplement to ResponsePetitioner
03/20/1969Brief on the MeritsRespondent
01/30/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/06/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/01/1969Response to Motion filed
06/25/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/11/1969Opinion issued
04/10/1969Post submission brief filed
03/31/1969Supplement to Response
03/20/1969Brief on the Merits
02/19/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/19/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/19/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/19/1969Document received (See Remarks)
01/30/1969Response to Petition
01/06/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/06/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
William A. King, et ux.Petitioner
Kenneth R. FlammRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information