judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS (TY) VS. STATE C/W 38349

Case Information: 38289
Short Caption:THOMAS (TY) VS. STATE C/W 38349Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:38289*, 38349
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010263Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-13528
08/30/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 38289/38349. 01-14706
09/21/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. The stipulation filed August 30, 2001, is approved and these appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve a fast track statement and appendix on or beofre October 1, 2001. Nos. 38289/38349. (01-15989) 01-15989
09/24/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: October 8, 2001. Nos. 38289/38349. (01-16106) 01-16106
10/10/2001MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File Fast Track Statement in Excess of Ten Pages. Nos. 38289/38349. 01-17074
10/30/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for leave to file a fast track statement in excess of 10 pages, filed October 10, 2001. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on October 10, 2001. Nos. 38389/38349. (01-18194) 01-18194
10/30/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Nos. 38289/38349. 01-17075
10/30/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Nos. 38289/38349. 01-17076
11/21/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. Nos. 38289/38349. (01-19610) 01-19610
11/21/2001AppendixFiled Appendix. Supplemental Joint Appendix. Nos. 38289/38349. (01-19611) 01-19611
01/03/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. fn1[These cases have been consolidated by this court for appeal, pursuant to a stipulation of the parties.] "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML. Nos. 38289/38349 02-00160
01/29/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00655
01/29/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/06/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 1, 2002. 02-00655