judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENNETH ERMIL JONES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0281)
Case Number:S-08-0281Case Docketed On:12/29/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:KENNETH ERMIL JONES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KENNETH ERMIL JONES, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKenneth Ermil JonesMichael H. Reese
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 44
Citation:228 P.3d 867

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/29/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA with proper attachments receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
12/29/2008Order - Sanction - notice of appeal judgment not attachedOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
12/29/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/05/2009Fees - Sanctions received - NOA attachmentFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
02/09/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/09/2009Motion - Other - Motion to withdraw as counsel.MotionOtherFinal
02/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion with withdrawEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Michael H. Reese for appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
02/10/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/03/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of the appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/11/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/12/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/01/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/08/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/08/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/29/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/28/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Michael Reese for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/13/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Michael H. Reese for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/13/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/16/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/04/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/04/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/07/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/6/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal