judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8973
C-8973
08/21/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
R. H. NEWDING INDIVIDUALLY AND d/b/a R. H. NEWDING
THE HONORABLE WILLIAM R. POWELL JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/28/1989Case StoredNO REHEARING FILED
08/21/1989Exhibits receivedINCORPORATED W/M/L/F
08/21/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruled
08/21/1989Motion to Stay DisposedDenied
08/21/1989Motion to Stay Filed INCORPORATED W/M/L/F
08/21/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
08/21/1989Petition for writ receivedINCORPORATED W/M/L/F
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/28/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
GECO GEOPHYSICAL COMPANY INC.RespondentMr. Paul D. Clote
AMOCO PRODUCTION COMPANYRespondentMr. A. Andrew Gallo
PANOCIANIC INCORPORATEDRelatorMr. Stanley G. Schneider
Court of Appeals Information:
01-89-00812-CV
Overruled
RULE 90, 08-17-89
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
80th District Court
Harris
86-16383