judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00785-CV
14-89-00785-CV
08/21/1989
Miscellaneous civil
1986 Mercedes
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/15/1989Case stored
11/04/1989Mandate Issued
11/04/1989Mandate Issued
10/20/1989No motion for rehearing FILED
10/05/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPDENIED
10/05/1989Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
10/05/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
10/05/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
10/04/1989Submitted
10/04/1989Submission
10/04/1989Submitted
09/07/1989Motion for extension of time to file bondDENIED
09/07/1989Motion for extension of time to file bondDENIED
09/05/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
08/22/1989Extend time to fild bond FILED - ANT,APE
08/21/1989Transcript received only; mtn. pending
08/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/02/1989Motion for new trial FILED
05/05/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasRay Elvin Speece
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. Candace Sturdivant
Trial Court Information
333rd District Court
Harris
Honorable DAVIE LEE WILSON
87-40874